# Vedic Maths Shortcut Tricks 2023 | Maths and Fun | Educating Point Last updated on September 17th, 2023 at 11:49 pm

# Vedic Maths Shortcut Tricks 2023

Vedic Maths is an ancient Indian mathematical system that provides an array of techniques and shortcuts to make complex calculations simpler and faster. In 2022, students and professionals alike can benefit from learning and mastering these Vedic Maths tricks for a more efficient approach to math problems. This comprehensive guide will introduce you to the most effective Vedic Maths tricks and shortcuts to help you unlock the power of math in 2022 in many competitive exam also.

Maths is a subject that often seems boring and tedious to many students. But it doesn’t have to be this way! There are actually many shortcut methods and tricks that can make learning and doing maths much more fun. One such method is Vedic Maths, an ancient system of mathematics from India that is based on simple, logical principles. In this blog post, we will explore some of the most popular Vedic Maths Shortcut Tricks 2022. From multiplication to division and more, these shortcuts will help you tackle even the most challenging maths problems with ease. So if you’re ready to make maths more fun, read on!

## Vedic Maths, Calculations, Multiplications, Division

When it comes to Vedic Maths, there is a lot that can be accomplished with shortcut tricks. Multiplications, divisions, and other calculations can be done quickly and easily with the help of these techniques. Here are some examples of what can be achieved:

• Multiplications can be done in a matter of seconds using Vedic Maths shortcut tricks.
• Divisions can also be done very quickly using these methods.
• Calculations involving large numbers can be simplified and done much faster than usual.

With the help of Vedic Maths shortcut tricks, anyone can do complex calculations quickly and easily. These methods are particularly useful for students who want to improve their math skills.

## What is Vedic Maths?

Vedic Maths is an ancient system of mathematics that was developed in India. It is based on the Vedas, which are the oldest texts in Hinduism.

Vedic Maths is said to be much more efficient than traditional methods of mathematics, and it has been gaining popularity in recent years. There are many shortcut tricks that can be used to solve problems quickly.

If you are interested in learning more about Vedic Maths, there are many resources available online and in books.

### The Different Types of Vedic Maths Tricks

There are a variety of Vedic Maths shortcut tricks that can be used to perform calculations quickly and easily. These tricks make use of the special properties of numbers and can be used to solve problems in a matter of seconds.

Some of the most popular Vedic Maths shortcut tricks include:

• The Sutra Method: This involves the use of special formulas or sutras that can be used to solve problems quickly.
• The Urdhva Tiryakbhyam Sutra: This sutra can be used to multiply two numbers quickly.
• The Anurupyena Sutra: This sutra can be used to divide one number by another.
• The Gunakasrama Sutra: This sutra can be used to find the square root of a number.

These are just some of the many Vedic Maths shortcut tricks that are available. With a little practice, anyone can master these techniques and perform calculations at lightning speeds!

### How to Use Vedic Maths Tricks

If you want to learn Vedic Maths, there are a few things you should keep in mind. First, it is important to understand the basic concepts behind the tricks. Second, you need to be able to do basic mental math quickly and accurately. And third, you need to practice, practice, practice!

Here are a few tips on how to use Vedic Maths Tricks:

1. Start with the basics: Before you start learning any shortcuts, it is important that you understand the basic concepts behind them. Otherwise, you will not be able to do the tricks correctly or apply them in solving problems.

2. Do mental math quickly and accurately: In order to do Vedic Maths Tricks correctly, you need to be able to do mental math quickly and accurately. This means that you need to practice doing simple calculations in your head without using a calculator or pen and paper.

3. Practice, practice, practice: The only way to get better at using Vedic Maths Tricks is to practice them as often as possible. So get a friend or family member involved and start practicing today!

## Vedic Maths Shortcut Tricks of All Competitive Exams

1. Square Vedic Maths Shortcut Tricks: Square of 25,35,65,85,105,115,135 etc

These Vedic tricks will help aspirants to save time in the exams. This rule is only applicable when the unit digit is ending with 5.

Step 1: In this method always consider the digits whichever is just left the Unit Digit as the 10th Digit. Find that number left to the unit digit and increase it by 1.

Step 2: Now the new number that we got after increasing it by 1 is multiplied by the given number that is just left to the unit digit.

Step 3: Now the Multiplying answer is again multiplied by 100.

Step 4: Now Square the unit digit number.

Step 5: Add the squared number with Step 3. This is the answer.

Example: If you want to find a square of 45

Step1:    Find the 10th digit number of 45 which is 4, now this number is increased by 1 and we get (4+1) = 5 (New Number)

Step 2: Multiplying 5 with 4

= 4*5 =20

Step 3: 20 is now multiplied with 100

= 20*100 =2000

Step 4: The unit digit number of the 45 is 5 and the square value of 5 is 25

= 5*5 =25

Step 5: Add 2000 with 25

= 2000 + 25 =2025 (Ans)

2. Method A

Multiplication Vedic Maths Short Tricks: 10th Place equal digits & unit place digits sum is 10: 73*77,57*53,33*37,43*47, 91*99,82*88,46*44, etc.

Step 1: In this method always consider the digits whichever is just left the Unit Digit as the 10th Digit and one of the 10th digits is increased by 1.

Step 2: Now the new number that we got after increasing it by 1 is multiplied by the new 10th digit number and other 10th digit numbers.

Step 3: Now the Multiplying answer is again multiplied by 100.

Step 4: Now multiply both the unit digits of both numbers.

Step 5: Add the Step 4 with Step 3. This is the answer.

Example:   87*83

Step 1: One of the 10th digits numbers is increased by 1 i.e., 9

Step 2: Multiplication: 8*9 =72

Step 3: 72 is now multiplied with 100 = 72*100 =7200

Step 4: New multiplying unit digits of both the numbers i.e., 7*3 =21

Step 5: Add 7200 & 21 = 7200 +21 =7221 (Ans)

Method B

Multiplication Vedic Maths Short Tricks: 10th Place equal digits & unit place digits sum is 10: 73*77,57*53,33*37,43*47, 91*99,82*88,46*44, etc.

Step 1: Multiply the 10th place digits of both numbers and add the multiplying answer with the 10th place digit number.

Step 2: Now Step 1 is multiplied with 100

Step 3: Now multiply both the unit digits of both numbers.

Step 4: Add the Step 3 with Step 4. This is the answer

Example: 87*83

Step 1: (8*8) +(8*1) [ Here 1 means Full] = 72

Step 2: 72*100 =7200

Step 3: 7*3 = 21

Step 4: 7200 +21 =7221

3. Multiplication Vedic Maths Short Tricks: 10th Place equal digits & unit place digits sum is 5: 12*13,23*22,32*33,42*43,52*53 etc

Step 1: Multiply the 10th place digits of both numbers and add the multiplying answer with Half of the 10th place digit number.

Step 2: Now Step 1 is multiplied with 100

Step 3: Now multiply both the unit digits of both numbers.

Step 4: Add the Step 3 with Step 4. This is the answer

Example:

A) 22*23

Step 1: (2*2) + (2*1/2) = 5

Step 2: (5*100) = 500

Step 3: (2*3) = 06

Step 4: 500+06 = 506 (Ans)

B) 52*53

= (5*5) + (5*1/2) =27.5

= 27.5 *100= 2750

= 2750 + 6

=2756 (Ans)

Note: This Unit place common method is also applied to the 10th place of any number.

Example

A) 26*86= (2*8 +6*1) *100 +36 =2236

B) 62*63 = (6*6 +3*2*1/2) *100 +06 =3906

C) 18*98 = (1*9 +8*1) *100+64 = 1764

4. Universal Multiplication Vedic Maths Tricks

A) 2- Digit Number Short Tricks

Step 1: First multiply the unit digits of both numbers and if there any number is left to the answer, then carried forward it to the next step.

Step 2: Cross the Multiplication of the number and add both multiplication answers.

Step 3: If any number carries forward from Step 1, is added to the Multiplication Answer from Step 2.

Step 4: After adding the number in Step 3, if there is any number want to carry then again carry it to the next step

Step 5: This is the last step of this process. Multiply the 10th digit number of both numbers and add the carry forwarded number to it.

Example:

a)62*47                             b)37*95                                         c)52*26

5. Multiplication Vedic Maths Short Tricks: Multiplication of any number with 11

Step 1: Solve from the right most of the number which is not 11. First, write the unit digit number as it is.

Step 2: Now add the unit digit number with its 10th digit number and if there any number is left of the answer, then carried forward it to the next step and the process will continue till the leftmost digit of the number.

Example:

A) 45 *11                                                               B) 97*11

= 4 (4+5) 5                                                        = 9 (9+7) 7

(Here No Carry Forward)                                    =9 (16) 7

= 495                                                                = 1067 (1 is Carry Forward to the 9)

C)1438*11

=14 (3+8) 8

=14 (11) 8 [1 will be carried forward to the next step]

=14(4+3+1) 18

=15818[ as there is no carry forward after adding 4+1]

6. Multiplication Vedic Maths Short Tricks: Multiplication Rule for Any number if Base is 10,100,1000,10000

Multiplication by 5

To multiply any number by 5, follow these steps based on whether the number is even or odd:

Even Number:

Example: 2464 x 5 =?

Step 1: 2464 / 2 = 1232

Step 2: Add a 0 to the end of the result: 12320

So, 2464 x 5 = 12320

Odd Number:

Example: 2245 x 5 =?

Step 1: Subtract 1 and divide by 2: (2245 – 1) / 2 = 1122

Step 2: Add a 5 to the end of the result: 11225

So, 2245 x 5 = 11225

Multiplication of Two-Digit Numbers Between 11 to 19

This Vedic Maths trick allows quick multiplication of any two-digit numbers between 11 to 19:

Example: 12 x 15 =?

Step 1: Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number: 15 + 2 = 17

Step 2: Multiply the result by 10: 17 x 10 = 170

Step 3: Multiply the unit digits of both numbers: 2 x 5 = 10

Step 4: Add the results from steps 2 and 3: 170 + 10 = 180

So, 12 x 15 = 180

Squaring of a Number Whose Unit Digit is 5

This Vedic Maths trick allows you to quickly find the square of a two-digit number ending in 5:

Example: Find (55)² =?

Step 1: 45 x 45 = …25 (end terms)

Step 2: 5 x (5+1) = 30

So, the answer is (45)² = 2025

## Vedic Maths Tricks for Addition and Subtraction

1. All from 9 and the last from 10

This Vedic Maths trick simplifies subtraction from multiples of 10, such as 1000, 10000, or 100000. Here’s how it works:

Example: 1000 – 571 =?

Subtract each digit in 473 from 9, and the last digit from 10:

Step 1: 9 – 5 = 4

Step 2: 9 – 7 = 2

Step 3: 10 – 1 = 9

So, the answer is 1000 – 571 = 429

This method simplifies the addition of multi-digit numbers using a criss-cross pattern:

Example: 254 + 178 =?

Step 1: Add the right-most digits (4 + 8 = 12). Write down 2 and carry 1.

Step 2: Criss-cross add the middle digits (2 + 7 and 5 + 1 = 15). Write 5 and carry 1.

Step 3: Add the leftmost digits (2 + 1 = 3). Write down the 3.

So, answer = 254 + 178 = 432

## Find the Square Value

Using this Vedic Maths trick, finding the square of a number is simple:

Example: Find (99)² =?

Step 1: Choose a base closer to the number (100 in this case)

Step 2: Find the difference of the number from the base: 99 – 100 = -1

Step 3: Add the difference to the number: 99 + (-1) = 98

Step 4: Multiply the result by the base: 98 x 100 = 9800

Step 5: Add the result with the square of the difference: 9800 + (-1)² = 9801

So, (99)² = 9801

## Vedic Maths Tricks for Division

1. Dividing a Large Number by 5

This trick allows you to quickly divide a large number by 5:

Example: 245 / 5 =?

Step 1: Multiply the number by 2: 245 x 2 = 490

Step 2: Move the decimal point to the left: 49.0 or 49

So, 245 / 5 = 49

2. Dividing a Number by Powers of 2

This Vedic Maths trick helps you divide a number by powers of 2 (2, 4, 8, and so on):

Example: Divide 128 by 8

Step 1: Count the number of powers of 2 needed to reach the divisor (2 x 2 x 2 = 8, so 3 powers of 2)

Step 2: Move the decimal point to the left by the number of powers counted in step 1: 128.00 -> 12.80 -> 1.28 -> 16

So, 128 / 8 = 16

## Vedic Maths Tricks for Solving Complex Problems

1. Solving Complex Multiplication Problems

This Vedic Maths trick helps you solve complex multiplication problems by breaking them into simpler parts:

Example: 123 x 321 =?

Step 1: Break the problem into smaller parts: (100 + 20 + 3) x (300 + 20 + 1)

Step 2: Multiply the parts: 100 x 300, 100 x 20, 100 x 1, 20 x 300, 20 x 20, 20 x 1, 3 x 300, 3 x 20, 3 x 1

Step 3: Add the results: 30000 + 2000 + 100 + 6000 + 400 + 20 + 900 + 60 + 3 = 39483

So, 123 x 321 = 39483

2. Solving Complex Division Problems

This Vedic Maths trick helps you solve complex division problems by breaking them into simpler parts:

Example: 864 / 24 =?

Step 1: Break the problem into smaller parts: (800 + 60 + 4) / (20 + 4)

Step 2: Divide the parts: 800 / 20, 800 / 4, 60 / 20, 60 / 4, 4 / 20, 4 / 4

Step 3: Combine the results: 40 + 200 + 3 + 15 + 0.2 + 1 = 36

So, 864 / 24 = 36

What are the Benefits of Vedic Maths Tricks?

Vedic Maths is an ancient system of mathematics that is gaining popularity in the modern world. There are many benefits of using Vedic Maths tricks, including:

1) Increased speed and accuracy in math calculations: The use of Vedic Maths tricks can help you to solve math problems faster and more accurately.

2) Improved problem-solving skills: By learning Vedic Maths tricks, you can develop better problem-solving skills. This can be helpful in both your personal and professional life.

3) Boosted confidence: With increased speed and accuracy in math calculations, you will feel more confident in your abilities. This can lead to success in other areas of your life as well.

## Vedic Maths Resources

There are a number of Vedic Maths resources available online and in print. Here are a few of our favorites:

Vedic Maths For Dummies by Bharati Krishna Tirthaji Maharaja: This book is a great introduction to the basics of Vedic Maths, with clear explanations and plenty of practice problems.

The Ultimate Book of Vedic Maths by Kenneth Williams: This comprehensive guide covers all the major topics in Vedic Maths, including algebra, geometry, and trigonometry.

Vedic Math Made Easy by Dhaval Bathia: This book contains easy-to-follow instructions and plenty of worked examples to help you master the basics of Vedic Maths.

Online Resources:

The Vedic Math Academy offers a range of online courses and resources to help you learn Vedic Maths.

The Sri Bharati Tirtha Institute also has a range of online courses available.

## Conclusion

Vedic Maths is a great way to improve your math skills and get better grades. However, it’s important to note that Vedic Maths is not a magic solution — you still need to put in the work to see results. But if you’re willing to put in the effort, Vedic Maths can be a helpful tool in your arsenal. So what are you waiting for? Start practicing those shortcut tricks today!

## FAQs:

Ques-1:How do I master Vedic maths?

a) Multiplication of any number by 11

b) Multiplication of any 2 digits,3 digit number by using the Base Method

c) Multiplication through Universal Mathematic Rules

d)Division Rules

Ques-2: What is Vedic Maths?

Vedic Maths is the collection of rules that help to solve the calculation in a quick manner.

Ques-3: What is the difference between Maths and Vedic Maths?

Vedic maths focuses on the techniques to solve the calculation at a fast pace but Normal Maths is, as usual, solving the question i.e., basic method !!

Share it: Hey there, welcome to Educating Point, This is Debashish Biswas, founder of this Website. I am having 4 years of offline content writing experience in different websites.